Marrone, Amanda Deanna (CPSO#: 77656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smithville Family Health Team
230 Canborough Street
Smithville ON  L0R 2A0
Phone: (905) 957-3328
Fax: (905) 957-2475
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanda Marrone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marrone ( CPSO# 77656 )

Business Address:
Smithville Family Health Team
230 Canborough Street
Box 218
Smithville ON  L0R 2A0
Phone Number: (905) 957-3328

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA DEANNA MARRONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004