Marshall, Shaun Allan (CPSO#: 70269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 480
271 Frances St
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone: (519) 357-1325
Fax: (519) 357-1568
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. & B. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Marshall ( CPSO# 64292 )
Dr. S. Marshall ( CPSO# 70269 )

Business Address:
271 Frances Street
P.O. Box 480
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-1325

Business Address:
1 - 1140 Southdale Road West
London ON  N6P 0E1
Phone Number: (519) 204-8200

Business Address:
South Bruce Grey Health Centre
43 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2K 3N1
Phone Number: (519) 364-2340

Business Address:
Braemar Retirement Home
719 Josephine Street
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3430

Business Address:
Wingham and District Hospital
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUN ALLAN MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1998