Martens-Kmiotek, Ewa Lidia (CPSO#: 54179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 Duncairn Road
Don Mills ON  M3B 1C8
Phone: (416) 447-9398
Fax: (416) 447-1756
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martens-Kmiotek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Martens-Kmiotek ( CPSO# 54179 )

Business Address:
24 Duncairn Road
Side Entrance
Don Mills ON  M3B 1C8
Phone Number: (416) 447-9398

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EWA LIDIA MARTENS-KMIOTEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTENS-KMIOTEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1989