Martin, Andrew Joseph (CPSO#: 60808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Wellington Family Health Team
Rockwood Clinic
175 Alma Street
Rockwood ON  N0B 2K0
Phone: (519) 856-4611
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew J. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Martin ( CPSO# 60808 )

Business Address:
East Wellington Family Health Team
Rockwood Clinic
175 Alma Street
Rockwood ON  N0B 2K0
Phone Number: (519) 856-4611

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOSEPH MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1990