Martin, Christopher Gerard (CPSO#: 66938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 - 14 Ramblewood Dr
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Phone: (705) 429-8270
Fax: (705) 429-7611
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. G. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Martin ( CPSO# 66938 )

Business Address:
101-14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Phone Number: (705) 429-8270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GERARD MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995