Martin, Geoffrey Allan (CPSO#: 103553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King St E
Oshawa ON  L1H1B9
Phone: 905-721-4951
Fax: 905-721-6621
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. A. Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Martin ( CPSO# 103553)

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4951

Business Address:
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 326-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY ALLAN MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016