Martin, Isabel (CPSO#: 75307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: 416-535-8501
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DaCambra Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 11 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISABEL MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2013