Martin, Joie Charlaine (CPSO#: 68856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
499 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H8
Phone: (519) 672-1495
Fax: (519) 434-3048
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joie Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Martin ( CPSO# 68856 )

Business Address:
499 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H8
Phone Number: (519) 672-1495

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOIE CHARLAINE MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997