Martin, Karen Ann (CPSO#: 60891)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1-36 McDonald Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2C2
Phone: (705) 645-2281
Fax: (705) 645-0057
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Martin ( CPSO# 60891 )

Business Address:
253 James Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 645-2281

Business Address:
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANN MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1990