Martin, Lorne William (CPSO#: 51387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 338-4456
Fax: (905) 338-4146
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Blair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Martin ( CPSO# 51387 )
Dr. C. Blair ( CPSO# 50122 )

Business Address:
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 350
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 842-2295


Corporation Name: Dr. Lorne Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Martin ( CPSO# 51387 )
Dr. C. Blair ( CPSO# 50122 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4456

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE WILLIAM MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983