Martin, Monique Dewitt (CPSO#: 95711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1243 Islington Ave
Suite 1004
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 766-1349
Fax: (416) 766-7310
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

726 Bloor Street West
Suite B-102
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 964-0800
Fax: (416) 964-2935
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIQUE DEWITT MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013