Martin-Godelie, Robin Sarah Catherine (CPSO#: 77556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B
Unit 4
65 Donly Drive
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone: (519) 426-0911
Fax: (519) 426-9753
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Martin-Godelie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Martin-Godelie ( CPSO# 77556 )

Business Address:
Suite B, Unit 4
65 Donly Drive
Simcoe ON  N3Y 0C2
Phone Number: (519) 426-0911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jan 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN SARAH CATHERINE MARTIN-GODELIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN-GODELIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2005