Martinek, Miroslav Robert (CPSO#: 57007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: 519 751 5544
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

525 Park Road North
Brantford ON  N3R 7K8
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martinek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Martinek ( CPSO# 57007 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
525 Park Road North
Brantford ON  N3R 7K8
Phone Number: (519) 754-1204

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIROSLAV ROBERT MARTINEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987