Martow, Jeffrey (CPSO#: 61607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7360
Fax: 905 472 7148
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Martow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Martow ( CPSO# 61607 )

Business Address:
Markham - Stouffville Health Centre
304 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY MARTOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1989