Marzouk, Sherief El-Sayed Mohamed (CPSO#: 87115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 3996
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health, Richmond Hill
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sherief Marzouk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Marzouk ( CPSO# 87115 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERIEF EL-SAYED MOHAMED MARZOUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARZOUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2009 to 14 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2012