Mascan, Lavinia Maria (CPSO#: 86931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yorkdale Medical Clinic
Unit A 103
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0K7
Phone: (905) 770-9057
Fax: (905) 917-0215
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mascan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mascan ( CPSO# 86931 )

Business Address:
Yorkdale Medical Clinic
Unit A 103
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0K7
Phone Number: (905) 770-9057

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAVINIA MARIA MASCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASCAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 10 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010