Mascia, Anthony Ted (CPSO#: 62512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242 1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mascia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2003

Dr. A. Mascia ( CPSO# 62512 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital - Finch Site
2111 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 1N1
Phone Number: (416) 744-2500

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Weston ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Hawaii

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ANTHONY TED MASCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASCIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991