Masliyah, Tamara Naima (CPSO#: 82864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
376 Churchill ave N, Suite 301
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5C3
Phone: 613-693-1900
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Masliyah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Masliyah ( CPSO# 82864 )

Business Address:
376 Churchill Avenue North
Suite 301
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5C3
Phone Number: (613) 693-1900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMARA NAIMA MASLIYAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASLIYAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011