Mason, Warren Phillip (CPSO#: 58008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 18 - 712
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2277
Fax: (416) 946-2284
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Warren Mason Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Mason ( CPSO# 58008 )

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Suite 18 - 712
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2277

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN PHILLIP MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 May 1987 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 May 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1989