Massicotte, Claude Jacques (CPSO#: 50032)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claude Massicotte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2017