Massicotte, Eric Maurice (CPSO#: 73887)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
4th Floor West Wing
Suite 447
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5675
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Massicotte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Massicotte ( CPSO# 73887 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Room 447W
West Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5675


Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC MAURICE MASSICOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASSICOTTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001