Masters, James Allan (CPSO#: 91269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
865 Regent St. S. Suite 429
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 671-7100 Ext. 1382
Fax: (705) 523-7160
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. A. Masters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Masters ( CPSO# 91269 )

Business Address:
865 Regent Street South
Suite 429
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 671-7100

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 19 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ALLAN MASTERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016