Masterson, Julia Anne (CPSO#: 62569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Weitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weitz ( CPSO# 43956 )
Dr. J. Masterson ( CPSO# 62569 )

Business Address:
Thrombosis and Atherosclerosis
Research Institute
237 Barton Street East
Suite C5-123
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 574-8550

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA ANNE MASTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASTERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1992