Matava, Rachelle Kristen (CPSO#: 86349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410 Ext. 2214
Fax: (519) 942-0483
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Matava ( CPSO# 86046 )
Dr. R. Matava ( CPSO# 86349 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHELLE KRISTEN MATAVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATAVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010