Mates, Mihaela (CPSO#: 80003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2630
Fax: (613) 546-8209
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mihaela Mates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mates ( CPSO# 80003 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Northeastern Ontario
Department of Medical Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2630

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIHAELA MATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jul 2003 to 10 Oct 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008