Mathur, Sanjiv (CPSO#: 68390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 4733
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjiv Mathur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mathur ( CPSO# 68390 )

Business Address:
Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 671-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJIV MATHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999