Matin, Samantha Anne (CPSO#: 102980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  29 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Academic
Family Health Team
581 Davis Drive Unit 201
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA ANNE MATIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MATIN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MATIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MATIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MATIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MATIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MATIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 29 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 29 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Dec 2017