Matsumoto, Edward Daisuke (CPSO#: 70188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Room G343
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6186
Fax: (905) 308-7205
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matsumoto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Matsumoto ( CPSO# 70188 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room G343
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6186

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD DAISUKE MATSUMOTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATSUMOTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004