Matthews, John Henry (CPSO#: 43141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4501
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 3
307A Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 3V3
Canada
Phone: (613) 409-8887
Fax: (613) 409-8889
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John H. Matthews Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Matthews ( CPSO# 43141 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
307A Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 3V3
Phone Number: (613) 409-8887

Business Address:
Department of Medicine
Queen's University
Room 2025 Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6803

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN HENRY MATTHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTHEWS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1996