Matusa, Elena (CPSO#: 97631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone: (519) 680 7772
Fax: (519) 937 9160
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elena Matusa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Matusa ( CPSO# 97631 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 680-7773

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA MATUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATUSA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015