Matzov, Aviram (CPSO#: 57241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410 Ext. 2232
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Matzov, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Matzov ( CPSO# 57241 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
11-15 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
53 First Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 2E3
Phone Number: (519) 942-8421

Business Address:
75 Fifth Avenue
Orangeville ON  L9W 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 941-5801

Business Address:
4 - 3160 Argentia Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 785-0007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVIRAM MATZOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATZOV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1987