Mau, Elaine (CPSO#: 88456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Connecticut, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Faxton-St.Luke's Healthcare
1656 Champlain Ave
Utica NY  13503
United States
Phone: (646) 477-5333
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 union st.
ellsworth ME  04605
United States
Phone: 2076645770
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maine
USA - New York
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE MAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013