Mawhinney, Shawn William (CPSO#: 72323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

235 Eagle Street
Suite 201
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J8
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-3727
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawn Mawhinney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mawhinney ( CPSO# 72323 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN WILLIAM MAWHINNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAWHINNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004