Maxwell, Robert Ian (CPSO#: 62867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Surgery
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
480 Huronia Road
Suite 102
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 792-0933
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Ian Maxwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maxwell ( CPSO# 62867 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Emergency Department
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
102 - 480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-0933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT IAN MAXWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXWELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991