Mayer, Perry Vincent (CPSO#: 63219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Mayer Institute
20 Railway Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 2R3
Phone: (905) 523-1444
Fax: (905) 523-6600
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mayer Choong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Choong ( CPSO# 66927 )
Dr. P. Mayer ( CPSO# 63219 )

Business Address:
The Mayer Institute
20 Railway Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 2R3

Business Address:
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Room HSC-3A78
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 929-2962

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PERRY VINCENT MAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 1990 to 30 Nov 1990
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1998