Mazza, Angela Marie (CPSO#: 51060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Names: Mazza-Whelan, Angela Marie (used until: 27 Apr 2017 )     Mazza, Angela Marie (used until: 20 Apr 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
135 Fennel Ave W
Hamilton ON  L9C 1E9
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

160 Dundurn Ave S
Hamilton ON  L8P 4K3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angela Mazza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mazza ( CPSO# 51060 )

Business Address:
160 Dundurn Avenue South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4K3

Business Address:
135 Fennell Avenue West
Hamilton ON  L9C 1E9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MARIE MAZZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1984