Mazza, Christopher Francis (CPSO#: 61074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2338 Hurontario Street Suite 202
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N1
Phone: (905)2327002
Fax: (905)2327005
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Mazza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mazza ( CPSO# 61074 )

Business Address:
202 - 2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 232-7002

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FRANCIS MAZZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1990