Mazzadi, Sergio Angel (CPSO#: 82104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 11 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32076
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sergio Mazzadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mazzadi ( CPSO# 82104 )

Business Address:
Department of Internal Medicine
St Joseph's Health Centre
50 Charlton Avenue East
Suite F535
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERGIO ANGEL MAZZADI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the MCMASTER UNIVERSITY, DIVISION OF GENERAL INTERNAL MEDICINE in which Dr. MAZZADI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. MAZZADI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MAZZADI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. MAZZADI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. MAZZADI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 26 Mar 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 27 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 10 May 2006
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 May 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2014