Mazzetti, Ian Alexander (CPSO#: 91200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Professional Centre
Suite 202
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 252-9861 Ext. 6
Fax: (519) 252-5443
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian A. Mazzetti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Mazzetti ( CPSO# 91200 )

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
202 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 252-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN ALEXANDER MAZZETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZZETTI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013