McCarron, Bonnie Isabel (CPSO#: 60721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: Wilson, Bonnie Isabel (used until: 27 May 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4370
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. McCarron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. McCarron ( CPSO# 60721 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 746-4104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 16 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BONNIE ISABEL MCCARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARRON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990