McCluskey, Stephen Douglas (CPSO#: 63554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
984 Oliver Road
Suite 102
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 766-3599
Fax: (807) 766-3598
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.D. McCluskey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McCluskey ( CPSO# 63554 )

Business Address:
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 766-3599

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 26 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN DOUGLAS MCCLUSKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLUSKEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 29 Apr 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2003 to 14 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2005 to 15 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992