Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

McCord, Phyllis Anne (CPSO#: 66944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
288 Dundas Street East
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Phone: (905) 689-8677
Fax: (905) 689-8393
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Phyllis McCord Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. McCord ( CPSO# 66944 )

Business Address:
288 Dundas Street East
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-8677

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHYLLIS ANNE MCCORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCORD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1995