McCormack, Brian Cornelius (CPSO#: 30431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores Ctr for Mental Healt
700 Gordon Street
Box 613
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 668-5881 Ext. 6310
Fax: (905) 430-4032
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

98 King Street West
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1R4
Canada
Phone: (905) 697-8161
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN CORNELIUS MCCORMACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCORMACK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Nov 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989