McCormack, David George (CPSO#: 32429)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1981


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6767
Fax: (519) 685-8406
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DG McCormack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Dr. D. McCormack ( CPSO# 32429 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 667-6767

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DAVID GEORGE MCCORMACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCORMACK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981