McCulloch, Janet Ruth (CPSO#: 52835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
916 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H1
Phone: (613) 531-6127
Fax: (613) 507-6127
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

207 Toronto St.
Kingston ON  K7L 4A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 217-8649
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

3725 Bell Line Road
Mountain Grove ON  K0H 2P0
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet R. McCulloch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McCulloch ( CPSO# 52835 )

Business Address:
916 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H1
Phone Number: (613) 531-6127

Business Address:
207 Toronto Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4A9
Phone Number: (613) 217-8649

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET RUTH MCCULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCULLOCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1985