McDonagh, Roderick John (CPSO#: 68925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Dept of Obstetrics&Gynecology
2Nd Floor Fontbonne
301 James St S
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905) 383-3336
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. McDonagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McDonagh ( CPSO# 68925 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
F415-1
301 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6041

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODERICK JOHN MCDONAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On December 20, 2011, at the Superior Court of Justice in Hamilton, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. McDonagh.