McDonagh, Thomas Henry Michael (CPSO#: 44825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1 A
163 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6J 1X9
Phone: (519) 872-8151
Fax: (519) 455-9879
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas H.M. McDonagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. McDonagh ( CPSO# 44825 )

Business Address:
Unit 1A
163 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6J 1X9
Phone Number: (519) 872-8151

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS HENRY MICHAEL MCDONAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONAGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1986