McDonald, Joanna Elizabeth (CPSO#: 63845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Newburgh Clinic
Box 129
5 Earl Street
Newburgh ON  K0K 2S0
Phone: (613) 378-1754
Fax: (613) 378-1776
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanna McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McDonald ( CPSO# 63845 )

Business Address:
Newburgh Clinic
5 Earl Street
Box 129
Newburgh ON  K0K 2S0
Phone Number: (613) 378-1754

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA ELIZABETH MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993