McDonald-Blumer, Heather (CPSO#: 51095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Names: McDonald Blumer, Mary Heather (used until: 16 Nov 2014 )     McDonald, Mary Heather (used until: 15 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2-002
60 Murray Street
Box 11
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4988
Fax: (416) 586-8228
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: McDonald Blumer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. McDonald-Blumer ( CPSO# 51095 )

Business Address:
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Building
Suite 2-002
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER MCDONALD-BLUMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD-BLUMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1985