McDonnell, Michael Bourke (CPSO#: 77215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Queen's University/Kingston General
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 766-0635
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael McDonnell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McDonnell ( CPSO# 77215 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 29 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BOURKE MCDONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONNELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003